Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1055 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7444 Week
» 27886 Month
» 364732 Year
» 1586297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #E1351
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1813   04/09/1936
J39 1997   04/01/1941
J39 4743   03/07/1947
J39 64901   18/01/1950