Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 542 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 542 Week
» 30040 Month
» 366886 Year
» 1588451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8024
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2781   11/11/1932
J39 2703   22/06/1935
J39 2720   01/05/1937
J39 2697   08/04/1939
J39 2973   24/04/1943
J39 2995   20/10/1945
J39 64921   23/04/1948