Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1055 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7444 Week
» 27886 Month
» 364732 Year
» 1586297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8772
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2976   25/11/1933
J39 2718   27/12/1935
J39 2782   23/07/1938
J39 2776   14/06/1941
J39 2952   01/12/1945
J39 4750   18/02/1948