Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 226 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4472 Week
» 1580 Month
» 108526 Year
» 1330091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #E1355
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1856   30/09/1936
J39 1933   12/10/1940
J39 2772   22/01/1944
J39 4876   31/07/1946
J39 64988   10/06/1950