Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 562 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 562 Week
» 30060 Month
» 366906 Year
» 1588471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2317
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1489   30/01/1930
J39 1425   02/08/1934
J39 1467   16/06/1938
J39 1477   18/06/1940
J39 1940   29/08/1943
J39 2772   28/08/1946
J39 64968   08/01/1949