Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 596 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 596 Week
» 30094 Month
» 366940 Year
» 1588505 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2573
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1472   27/03/1934
J39 1482   01/08/1940
J39 1477   27/02/1943
J39 4917   27/12/1947