Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3077/20D/129
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sat |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q4 |
148 |
|
20/10/1923 |
Q4 |
6177 |
|
30/11/1929 |
Q4 |
5148 |
|
01/08/1931 |
Q4 |
5149 |
|
10/03/1934 |
J39 |
1412 |
|
15/03/1934 |
Q4 |
6177 |
|
08/08/1936 |
|