Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 310 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 310 Week
» 7115 Month
» 114061 Year
» 1335626 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4601
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 11/08/1923
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 20/04/1926
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 17/11/1928
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 10/01/1931
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 11/01/1933
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 11/08/1937
Castle 5077 FAIREY BATTLE 03/03/1943
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 02/04/1946
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 14/05/1948
Castle 5032 USK CASTLE 29/03/1950
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 02/10/1952
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 15/06/1955