Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4614
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 30/05/1925
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 13/12/1928
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 27/03/1931
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 11/01/1934
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 17/10/1936
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 03/07/1943
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 04/03/1948
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 16/01/1950
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 08/02/1952
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 28/01/1957