Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 349 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 349 Week
» 7154 Month
» 114100 Year
» 1335665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4615
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 10/06/1925
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 23/02/1929
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 04/02/1931
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 13/01/1933
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 01/11/1937
Castle 5032 USK CASTLE 19/06/1942
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 09/03/1949