Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 587 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6192 Week
» 17739 Month
» 417421 Year
» 494008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4635
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 30/06/1927
Castle 4009 SHOOTING STAR 21/01/1932
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 02/04/1935
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 18/06/1938
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 14/03/1945
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 21/10/1947
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 21/10/1947
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 31/03/1949
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 07/02/1951
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 10/09/1953