Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 150 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1225 Week
» 22127 Month
» 22127 Year
» 1243692 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4657
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 27/03/1926
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 03/04/1930
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 02/03/1932
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 14/08/1936
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 08/07/1943
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 14/02/1947
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 06/12/1948
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 22/08/1950
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 26/09/1952