Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 646 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7207 Week
» 28109 Month
» 28109 Year
» 1249674 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4620
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 15/08/1925
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 04/05/1928
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 22/01/1931
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 16/01/1933
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 13/02/1936
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 20/02/1941
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 11/10/1945
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 20/08/1947
Castle 5056 EARL OF POWIS 09/05/1949
Castle 5014 GOODRICH CASTLE 01/11/1950