Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 409 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1748 Week
» 31246 Month
» 368092 Year
» 1589657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4603
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 01/1924
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 04/05/1927
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 27/03/1931
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 20/03/1934
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 14/01/1938
Castle 5072 HURRICANE 03/04/1944
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 25/11/1947
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 20/09/1951
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 15/12/1953
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 23/11/1955