Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1173 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8627 Week
» 11209 Month
» 275842 Year
» 1497407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4658
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 10/04/1926
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 16/03/1931
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 22/06/1933
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 24/08/1938
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 01/12/1944
Castle 5023 BRECON CASTLE 24/12/1946
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 19/01/1949
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 02/11/1950
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 06/10/1955