Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 540 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5796 Week
» 24379 Month
» 221896 Year
» 298483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6612
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 01/05/1934
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 30/12/1937
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 06/11/1944
Castle 5074 HAMPDEN 31/10/1946
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 21/09/1949
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 28/02/1952
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 22/03/1955
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 03/06/1957