Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 347 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 347 Week
» 7152 Month
» 114098 Year
» 1335663 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6672
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 28/12/1937
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 22/12/1942
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 05/05/1947
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 12/01/1951
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 24/03/1953
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 16/09/1955
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 04/03/1957
Castle 5060 EARL OF BERKELEY 26/08/1959
Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE 20/10/1961