Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 286 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 286 Week
» 7091 Month
» 114037 Year
» 1335602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6634
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5047 COMPTON CASTLE 21/04/1936
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 02/03/1944
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 30/05/1946
Castle 5081 LOCKHEED HUDSON 03/11/1948
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 13/06/1950
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 11/12/1951
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 03/02/1954
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 20/09/1956
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 05/01/1959
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 27/01/1961