Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1323 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14729 Week
» 67745 Month
» 187272 Year
» 3214125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6642
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5055 |
LYDFORD CASTLE |
09/06/1936 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
15/04/1941 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
09/06/1945 |
Castle |
5045 |
EARL OF DUDLEY |
25/02/1947 |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
09/03/1950 |
Castle |
5095 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
16/11/1951 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
04/12/1953 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
23/12/1955 |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
24/09/1958 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
19/12/1960 |
|