Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 461 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1800 Week
» 31298 Month
» 368144 Year
» 1589709 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4642
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 09/04/1929
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 01/07/1932
Castle 4076 CARMARTHEN CASTLE 26/08/1935
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 28/01/1939
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 04/05/1944
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 26/03/1946
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 30/07/1948