Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6658
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5071 CLIFFORD CASTLE 07/07/1938
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 12/09/1942
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 15/04/1946
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 16/10/1947
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 31/01/1950
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 12/10/1950
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 20/08/1951
Castle 4076 CARMARTHEN CASTLE 29/07/1953
Castle 5090 NEATH ABBEY 21/04/1955
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 25/10/1957
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 09/10/1959