Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 18251 Month
» 187023 Year
» 1071404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4645
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 01/10/1929
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 09/12/1932
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 03/07/1936
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 01/06/1943
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 05/01/1946
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 20/09/1949
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 01/06/1951
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 27/08/1953