Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14455 Week
» 67471 Month
» 186998 Year
» 3213851 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6668
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5081 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
27/05/1939 |
Castle |
5004 |
LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE |
10/07/1944 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
18/11/1946 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
19/01/1949 |
Castle |
5046 |
EARL CAWDOR |
05/04/1951 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
28/06/1955 |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
22/03/1961 |
|