Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6678
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5089 |
WESTMINSTER ABBEY |
01/11/1939 |
Castle |
4099 |
KILGERRAN CASTLE |
25/01/1946 |
Castle |
5007 |
ROUGEMONT CASTLE |
16/11/1948 |
Castle |
5038 |
MORLAIS CASTLE |
18/08/1950 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
14/08/1952 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
21/06/1956 |
Castle |
7016 |
CHESTER CASTLE |
06/10/1958 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
10/11/1960 |
|