Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4606
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 24/02/1924
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 12/04/1927
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 28/08/1928
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 21/06/1930
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 07/10/1932
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 13/08/1935
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 04/11/1938
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 23/11/1942
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 20/03/1945
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 31/07/1947
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 14/06/1949
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 23/08/1949
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 27/02/1951
Castle 5061 EARL OF BIRKENHEAD 03/06/1952
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 28/07/1954