Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 775 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 775 Week
» 18111 Month
» 295907 Year
» 1180288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4613
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 09/05/1925
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 09/06/1928
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 30/11/1931
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 29/11/1934
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 03/02/1938
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 17/01/1945
Castle 5075 WELLINGTON 19/02/1948