Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 538 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5794 Week
» 24377 Month
» 221894 Year
» 298481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6673
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 17/08/1944
Castle 5046 EARL CAWDOR 18/01/1946
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 14/11/1947
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 02/08/1949
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 07/04/1953
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 06/05/1955
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 08/12/1957
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 31/12/1957