Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 548 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5804 Week
» 24387 Month
» 221904 Year
» 298491 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6643
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5056 OGMORE CASTLE 28/06/1936
Castle 5053 EARL CAIRNS 05/02/1941
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 02/02/1946
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 13/04/1948
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 09/03/1950
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 29/01/1952
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 11/06/1953
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 22/06/1955
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 10/12/1956
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 13/01/1959
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 18/08/1960