Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2135 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15541 Week
» 68557 Month
» 188084 Year
» 3214937 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6624
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5037 |
MONMOUTH CASTLE |
31/05/1935 |
Castle |
5042 |
WINCHESTER CASTLE |
21/08/1940 |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
07/06/1945 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
22/10/1946 |
Castle |
5027 |
FARLEIGH CASTLE |
08/02/1949 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
30/11/1950 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
22/01/1953 |
Castle |
5086 |
VISCOUNT HORNE |
09/02/1955 |
Castle |
5038 |
MORLAIS CASTLE |
27/05/1957 |
Castle |
5027 |
FARLEIGH CASTLE |
26/06/1959 |
|