Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14258 Week
» 67274 Month
» 186801 Year
» 3213654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6681
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5094 |
TRETOWER CASTLE |
16/06/1939 |
Castle |
5023 |
BRECON CASTLE |
26/12/1943 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
10/01/1947 |
Castle |
5046 |
EARL CAWDOR |
14/06/1949 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
26/04/1951 |
Castle |
5010 |
RESTORMEL CASTLE |
14/05/1953 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
17/05/1955 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
27/08/1957 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
29/09/1959 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
01/03/1962 |
|