Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 340 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 340 Week
» 7145 Month
» 114091 Year
» 1335656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4641
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 29/05/1931
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 22/01/1934
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 14/04/1938
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 21/03/1944
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 09/03/1946
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 17/09/1948
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 21/11/1950