Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6665
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5078 LAMPHEY CASTLE 15/05/1939
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 23/12/1943
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 08/12/1945
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 17/09/1947
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 02/06/1949
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 26/02/1952
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 26/02/1952
Castle 5062 EARL OF SHAFTESBURY 08/01/1954
Castle 5017 THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST 07/09/1960