Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 309 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 309 Week
» 7114 Month
» 114060 Year
» 1335625 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6623
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 04/06/1935
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 02/05/1939
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 23/06/1944
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 29/01/1945
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 03/05/1946
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 30/06/1948
Castle 5090 NEATH ABBEY 21/07/1950
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 06/06/1952
Castle 5047 EARL OF DARTMOUTH 03/11/1954