Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 344 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8683 Week
» 5791 Month
» 112737 Year
» 1334302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4627
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 03/08/1926
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 25/10/1928
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 20/08/1930
Castle 4009 SHOOTING STAR 20/04/1934
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 02/03/1938
Castle 5053 EARL CAIRNS 19/06/1943
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 30/01/1945
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 30/05/1947
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 22/04/1949
Castle 4080 POWDERHAM CASTLE 09/01/1952
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 26/05/1953