Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 677 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18480 Week
» 71496 Month
» 191023 Year
» 3217876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4609
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
03/1924 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
17/05/1927 |
Castle |
4085 |
BERKELEY CASTLE |
26/03/1930 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
09/12/1932 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
04/02/1936 |
Castle |
4093 |
DUNSTER CASTLE |
10/09/1942 |
Castle |
5064 |
BISHOP'S CASTLE |
27/08/1946 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
02/03/1949 |
|