Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 438 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 438 Week
» 7243 Month
» 114189 Year
» 1335754 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4622
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 25/08/1928
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 20/02/1931
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 21/12/1934
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 05/03/1938
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 08/06/1945
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 04/06/1947
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 06/09/1949