Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 797 Today
» 975 Yesterday
» 797 Week
» 22505 Month
» 285482 Year
» 362069 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6625
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 21/06/1935
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 06/09/1941
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 12/10/1945
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 18/06/1947
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 03/12/1948
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 01/06/1951
Castle 5022 WIGMORE CASTLE 07/05/1953
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 21/04/1955
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 12/03/1957