Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 643 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7204 Week
» 28106 Month
» 28106 Year
» 1249671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6654
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5065 UPTON CASTLE 09/07/1937
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 23/09/1943
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 28/04/1947
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 21/02/1951
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 03/09/1952
Castle 5052 EARL OF RADNOR 17/11/1954
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 24/10/1957