Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 511 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1850 Week
» 31348 Month
» 368194 Year
» 1589759 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6655
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 03/06/1938
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 28/04/1944
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 05/12/1945
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 27/04/1948
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 19/05/1950
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 20/02/1952
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 26/08/1954
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 12/11/1956
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 15/05/1959
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 04/09/1961