Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 859 Today
» 1285 Yesterday
» 3381 Week
» 31772 Month
» 157249 Year
» 233836 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6637
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5050 DEVIZES CASTLE 05/1936
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 10/02/1941
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 04/07/1945
Castle 5056 EARL OF POWIS 11/09/1947
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 26/10/1949
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 25/01/1952
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 02/04/1954
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 10/05/1956
Castle 5074 HAMPDEN 23/04/1958
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 09/02/1960