Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 825 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3385 Week
» 16418 Month
» 238819 Year
» 1123200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6636
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5049 DENBIGH CASTLE 08/05/1936
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 09/12/1941
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 21/07/1945
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 19/01/1948
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 17/10/1949
Castle 5088 LLANTHONY ABBEY 16/08/1951
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 18/10/1955
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 27/03/1958
Castle 4081 WARWICK CASTLE 22/01/1960