Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 275 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 275 Week
» 7080 Month
» 114026 Year
» 1335591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4610
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 12/04/1924
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 20/12/1927
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 26/11/1929
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 22/03/1934
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 01/07/1937
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 24/12/1942
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 03/10/1946
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 25/11/1948
Castle 5059 EARL ST ALDWYN 24/08/1950
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 07/11/1952
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 15/03/1956
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 01/08/1958