Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 577 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3720 Week
» 13890 Month
» 291686 Year
» 1176067 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4626
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 29/07/1926
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 13/05/1930
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 23/02/1934
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 08/04/1937
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 18/05/1942
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 15/09/1944
Castle 5057 EARL WALDEGRAVE 23/04/1947
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 30/05/1949
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 14/03/1952
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 24/02/1954
Castle 5053 EARL CAIRNS 04/09/1958