Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 647 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7208 Week
» 28110 Month
» 28110 Year
» 1249675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6611
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 28/04/1934
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 04/10/1938
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 30/11/1942
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 30/11/1942
Castle 5060 EARL OF BERKELEY 09/02/1945
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 08/02/1947
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 04/01/1949
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 04/01/1949
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 13/06/1952
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 28/09/1956