Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 647 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7208 Week
» 28110 Month
» 28110 Year
» 1249675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6693
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7001 DENBIGH CASTLE 31/05/1946
Castle 5099 COMPTON CASTLE 13/02/1948
Castle 7007 GREAT WESTERN 27/01/1950
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 30/11/1951
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 05/01/1954
Castle 5081 LOCKHEED HUDSON 19/04/1956
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 05/04/1960