Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 284 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3523 Week
» 16036 Month
» 104228 Year
» 988609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7625
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7028 CADBURY CASTLE 06/1950
Castle 7015 CARN BREA CASTLE 12/01/1954
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 19/12/1955
Castle 5072 HURRICANE 29/07/1958
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 02/12/1960