Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 475 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8814 Week
» 5922 Month
» 112868 Year
» 1334433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7608
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7016 CHESTER CASTLE 09/1948
Castle 7022 HEREFORD CASTLE 20/12/1950
Castle 7018 DRYSLLWYN CASTLE 30/06/1953
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 29/05/1958
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 02/05/1960