Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3877 Week
» 21213 Month
» 299009 Year
» 1183390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7640
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5075 WELLINGTON 23/11/1950
Castle 7014 CAERHAYS CASTLE 06/01/1954
Castle 7002 DEVIZES CASTLE 07/11/1955
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 06/01/1960
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 22/12/1961