Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3518 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16924 Week
» 69940 Month
» 189467 Year
» 3216320 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6618
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5031 |
TOTNES CASTLE |
24/05/1934 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
25/02/1937 |
Castle |
4097 |
KENILWORTH CASTLE |
17/12/1941 |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
02/03/1948 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
03/05/1950 |
Castle |
4092 |
DUNRAVEN CASTLE |
28/05/1952 |
Castle |
5010 |
RESTORMEL CASTLE |
05/01/1955 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
17/04/1957 |
|