Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 461 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1800 Week
» 31298 Month
» 368144 Year
» 1589709 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4652
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 06/08/1925
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 09/03/1929
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 04/02/1932
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 04/12/1936
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 04/04/1942
Castle 5052 EARL OF RADNOR 12/09/1946
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 28/11/1947
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 07/03/1950
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 25/07/1952
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 15/03/1956